HARLOW HILLTOP PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1129463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £91.28k £121.84k £123.46k £122.96k £158.05k
Total expenditure £88.25k £92.64k £94.98k £99.68k £134.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £115.31k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £4.29k £418