Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST TEILO'S SCHOOL TENBY

Charity number: 1131565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.04k £5.55k £6.99k £3.70k £227
Total expenditure £14.28k £4.97k £16.73k £2.18k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A