Trustees LONDON CHRISTIAN SCHOOL LTD
Charity number: 1133692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS FISHLOCK | Chair |
|
||||||
Martha Isabel West | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Wright | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Juliet McCallister | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIR CHARLES HOARE BT | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA COLLETT WHITE | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Ammoun | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Theo Jones | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL WILDE | Trustee | 17 March 2010 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.