THE LONDON REGIMENT WELFARE AND BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1130304
Charity reporting is overdue by 599 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 March 2017 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required