NORWICH CHRISTIAN RESOURCES

Charity number: 1135412
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 08 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 August 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 03 August 2018 4 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download