WARSASH (NO. 636) UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 1129819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download