WARSASH (NO. 636) UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 1129819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Howard Lee Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Capt Matthew Bolton RN Chair 21 November 2013
THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY Received: On time
Neil Sherrington Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Ian Praine Trustee 20 March 2018 None on record
Elaine Stewart-Page Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN SELMES Trustee None on record
Susan Lindsey Hobbs Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Adam Travell Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Stephen Paul Johansen Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record