LONDON CONTEMPORARY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1129768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £295.74k £613.34k £755.31k £884.18k £790.70k
Total expenditure £262.65k £612.09k £669.90k £879.60k £725.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £53.92k £117.24k £59.55k £56.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £540.73k £628.29k £794.83k £712.85k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £6 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £18.69k £9.77k £29.80k £21.25k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £608.35k £664.39k £868.60k £725.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £3.74k £5.51k £11.00k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0