Financial history THE EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1131060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £270.59k £194.96k £234.74k £286.14k £352.67k
Total expenditure £203.02k £228.79k £242.30k £280.24k £310.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A £33.00k £28.40k £85.27k