THE COLLEGE OF ALL SOULS OF THE FAITHFUL DEPARTED, OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1138057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

70 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Vladimir Markovic Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Professor Miriam Meyerhoff Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR CECILIA TRIFOGLI Trustee None on record
RT HON DR JOHN REDWOOD MP Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR PETER WILSON Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID GELLNER Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR CECILIA HEYES FBA Trustee None on record
FITZROY MORRISSEY Trustee 05 November 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR NEIL KENNY FBA Trustee 01 October 2012 None on record
Professor Dame Marina Warner DBE FBA, Trustee 15 June 2019
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LITERATURE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dr ALEX MULLEN Trustee 01 January 2017
THE BRITISH EPIGRAPHY SOCIETY Received: On time
THOMAS SEAMAN Trustee None on record
LORD DAVID PANNICK QC Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR FRANCIS BROWN Trustee 01 August 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR CECILE FABRE Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR SUSANNE BOBZIEN Trustee 27 August 2013 None on record
ANDREW WYNN OWEN Trustee 08 November 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR Amia Srinivasan Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Dr Karolina Watroba Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Dr Richard Davenport-Hines Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR SIMON GREEN Trustee
SOCIAL AFFAIRS UNIT Received: On time
PROFESSOR SUZANNE AIGRAIN Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL FENDLEY Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR LUCIA HELEN ZEDNER Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
MAX DAVID NOBLE HARRIS Trustee 20 November 2014 None on record
KATHERINE ALEXANDRA LAUREN BACKLER Trustee 06 November 2016 None on record
SIR NOEL MALCOLM FBA Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR GAVIN SALAM Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR EFSTATHIOS KALYVAS Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
CLAIRE HALL Trustee 08 November 2015 None on record
Alexander Georgiou Trustee 03 November 2019 None on record
Dr CLARE BUCKNELL Trustee 15 November 2012 None on record
Tess Little Trustee 02 November 2014 None on record
Dr Jasmine Nirody Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
KATHERINE RUNDELL Trustee 12 June 2016 None on record
Dr LISA LODWICK Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
MAYA KRISHNAN Trustee 03 November 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR IAN RUMFITT Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
SARAH BUFKIN Trustee 05 November 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR LUCIA PRAUSCELLO Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR JOHN NICHOLAS PEREGRINE HORDEN Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR CATRIONA SETH Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record
THE VERY REVEREND JOHN DRURY Trustee None on record
SIR LAUNCELOT HENDERSON Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR WOLFGANG ERNST Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Dr Frederick Wilmot-Smith Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR JULIA MARY HOWARD SMITH Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
Dr Anne Wolf Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
George Woudhuysen Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
Lord William Arthur Waldegrave of North Hill PC, MA Trustee
COUTTS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE KYNGE'S COLLEGE OF OUR LADYE OF ETON BESYDE WINDESORE Received: On time
PROFESSOR, SIR JOHN VICKERS Chair
THE DOROTHY VERNON CHARITY Received: On time
DAVID ADDISON Trustee 05 November 2017 None on record
Professor Dame Angela McLean Trustee
DRAGON SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Professor Catherine Redgwell Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR MARK CHRISTOPHER ARMSTRONG FBA Trustee 07 December 2011 None on record
Dr DMITRI LEVITIN Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
RUTH HARRIS Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR CATHERINE MORGAN OBE Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
JOHN MERRINGTON Trustee 03 November 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR DIWAKAR ACHARYA Trustee 01 April 2016
THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR HINDU STUDIES Received: On time
Chun Hin Lucas Tse Trustee 02 November 2019 None on record
Dr Kyle Pratt Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR ANDREW IAN WILSON Trustee None on record
PROF IAN LOADER Trustee None on record
Dr ROSS ANDERSON Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Dr Rachel Bryan Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR SANTANU DAS Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Dr SRIKANTH TOPPALADODDI Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR COLIN BURROW Trustee None on record
Dr Rima Karolina Dapous Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record