Financial history THE BEECHVIEW SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1130987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £672 £4.82k £880 £0 £2.15k
Total expenditure £0 £3.00k £0 £0 £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A