WOLFSON COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1141446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.95m £7.15m £7.42m £7.72m £7.71m
Total expenditure £7.18m £7.60m £7.82m £8.69m £7.67m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.43k £13.62k £17.52k £21.64k £20.53k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.33m £1.92m £823.81k £868.00k £3.29m
Income - Other trading activities £507.30k £497.68k £599.19k £552.00k £401.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.51m £4.79m £4.79m £4.93m £4.80m
Income - Endowments £656.50k £1.18m £43.21k £106.00k £2.70m
Income - Investment £1.22m £1.06m £1.23m £1.37m £1.49m
Income - Other £36.90k £58.27k £27.59k £21.00k £432.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £207.00k £40.00k £21.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.09m £6.71m £6.65m £7.65m £6.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £546.78k £280.93k £581.12k £1.04m £839.00k
Expenditure - Governance £17.68k £20.40k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.60k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £203.70k £190.90k £261.51k £188.00k £150.00k
Expenditure - Other £543.64k £616.21k £583.96k £0 £0