JUST WORLD PARTNERSHIPS

Charity number: 1136425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2017 17 March 2019 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2016 14 September 2018 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2015 02 March 2017 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2015 Not Required