Financial history KING'S GATE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1130035
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £93.48k £59.40k £60.88k £37.54k £21.47k
Total expenditure £119.77k £51.48k £53.87k £35.17k £15.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A