ST.PETER'S SCHOOL, YORK

Charity number: 1141329
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Widdicombe Trustee 14 September 2015 None on record
Carol Rosemary Bonita Bailey Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
ADRIAN TAYLOR Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
PHILLIP B HILLING Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
Charlotte Louise Smart Trustee 19 November 2021 None on record
Mark Calvert Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
Tracey Louise Flannery Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Jenny Copley-Farnell Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
WILLIAM WOOLLEY Chair 25 June 2013 None on record
DR Nigel Philip Durham Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Dr Thomas Charles Buckland McLeish Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
DR Simon Hinchcliffe Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record