THE BRIDGE LANE BETH HAMEDRASH

Charity number: 1130334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £217.89k £221.10k £227.60k £211.11k £279.36k
Total expenditure £208.71k £204.44k £203.09k £217.32k £322.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A