NOTTINGHAM EQUAL

Charity number: 1138132
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 16 March 2021 77 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 22 December 2016 On time Download