NOTTINGHAM EQUAL

Charity number: 1138132
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £228.81k £158.00k £163.50k £171.81k £128.94k
Total expenditure £213.77k £202.79k £159.96k £171.53k £128.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £75.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £228.81k £75.00k £163.50k N/A £128.94k