VOICES IN EXILE

Charity number: 1130363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On time Download