ZAHERA TRUST

Charity number: 1132956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £51.91k £39.00k £33.03k £35.57k £9.64k
Total expenditure £13.68k £33.93k £34.95k £25.05k £9.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A