Financial history The Arts Society Southwold

Charity number: 1132568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £17.10k £18.74k £18.39k £8.75k £7.34k
Total expenditure £18.02k £18.39k £17.77k £10.55k £7.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A