Trustees People's Theatre Collective Ltd
Charity number: 1137145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Scott Adkin | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Catalina Marin | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Denise Keeping | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Karin Manning | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clinton Osborne | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Peta Mumford | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Howe | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anna Therese Frazer | Trustee | 07 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.