COLLEGE OF CORPUS CHRISTI AND OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 15 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 April 2017 On time Download