CREATIVE MENTORS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1130788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £127.52k £116.95k £115.38k £22.94k £18.52k
Total expenditure £109.70k £96.53k £44.04k £75.19k £72.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A