THE SOCIETY OF INTERNATIONAL ECONOMIC LAW

Charity number: 1133176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time Download