VALUES ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131991
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.08m £1.12m £1.20m £1.20m £1.27m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.06m £1.08m £1.19m £1.25m
Income from government contracts £0 £1.10m N/A N/A £1.27m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.74k £15.00k £526 £14.34k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.10m £1.20m £1.18m £1.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8 £0 £0 £102 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.06m £1.08m £1.19m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0