CARDINAL ALLEN TRUST

Charity number: 1139044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 14 April 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 21 August 2019 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 28 May 2017 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required