MOSAME PROJECTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1132546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 February 2021 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 March 2019 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required