Trustees THE DAPHNE ORAM TRUST
Charity Number: 1134910

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angharad Cooper | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sutton | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alannah Chance | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Matthew Richards | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MORGAN | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sarah Laurence | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN WENDON SCALES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL STUART GRIERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.