AL ANSAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1132684
Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £6.35k £6.25k £2.00k £49.92k £80.24k
Total expenditure £6.60k £5.20k £2.00k £45.30k £74.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A