THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (ROCK OF REDEMPTION (APATA IRAPADA) CHADWELL HEATH)

Charity number: 1132368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 13 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 05 July 2017 On time Download