Financial history LOCALGIVING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1132411
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.62m £3.46m £4.33m £4.70m £10.98m
Total expenditure £3.48m £3.59m £3.74m £4.82m £10.44m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £256.85k N/A N/A N/A £1.00m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.43m £3.26m £4.12m £4.38m £10.61m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £311.83k £364.82k
Income - Charitable activities £190.61k £199.95k £211.29k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £725 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.44m £3.59m £3.69m £4.64m £9.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.60k £2.45k £0 £180.95k £679.77k
Expenditure - Governance £7.20k £10.56k £39.64k £124.20k £94.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.28m £2.91m £3.10m £4.00m £9.10m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £399 £605 £44.13k £4.47k £566.28k