Financial history LOCALGIVING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1132411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.70m £10.98m £7.85m £8.73m £8.78m
Total expenditure £4.82m £10.44m £8.03m £9.11m £9.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.38m £10.61m £7.49m £8.24m £7.81m
Income - Other trading activities £311.83k £364.82k £354.70k £487.94k £968.42k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £725 £0 £0 £404 £879
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.64m £9.19m £6.76m £7.62m £8.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £180.95k £679.77k £1.27m £1.49m £1.37m
Expenditure - Governance £124.20k £94.62k £29.61k £23.13k £437.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.00m £9.10m £6.65m £7.16m £7.89m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.47k £566.28k £0 £0 £0