Financial history INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNESS LONDON

Charity number: 1132794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.79m £1.98m £1.99m £1.21m £1.97m
Total expenditure £1.73m £1.82m £1.98m £1.31m £1.53m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £289.25k £199.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £602.63k £650.63k £693.39k £636.82k £722.40k
Income - Other trading activities £1.19m £1.31m £1.30m £253.31k £606.82k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £405.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54 £48 £220 £26.15k £33.96k
Income - Other £0 £13.65k £0 £289.25k £199.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £117.23k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.05m £1.00m £221.30k £352.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds £636.17k £760.86k £977.39k £525.41k £650.38k
Expenditure - Governance £104.86k £9.75k £0 £6.50k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £17.88k £0 £562.50k £527.84k