WOOLWICH REACH TRUST

Charity number: 1140713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £123.57k £126.80k £127.14k £130.36k £132.89k
Total expenditure £123.57k £126.80k £127.14k £130.36k £132.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A