2ND BROOKLANDS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1132709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.69k £5.97k £6.93k £9.11k £1.36k
Total expenditure £5.89k £7.70k £2.03k £8.14k £608
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A