Financial history FRIENDS OF WEARDALE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1133650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £22.78k £16.11k £16.73k £19.12k £10.33k
Total expenditure £25.35k £10.71k £16.34k £46.19k £12.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £0 N/A N/A £320