Financial history HADDENHAM BEER FESTIVALS TRUST

Charity number: 1136844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £104.55k £109.80k £114.90k £110.24k £3.12k
Total expenditure £111.51k £104.98k £110.04k £105.77k £27.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A