Financial history OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1133586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.59m £1.66m £1.66m £5.43m £5.01m
Total expenditure £1.70m £1.69m £1.71m £4.05m £5.07m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £719.00k £749.00k £823.00k £4.66m £4.14m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £859.00k £899.00k £822.00k £750.00k £854.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.00k £14.00k £15.00k £16.00k £13.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.69m £1.71m £4.05m £5.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £20.00k £23.00k £16.00k £22.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0