Trustees OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1133586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RIGHT REVD DR ALAN THOMAS LAWRENCE WILSON Chair 21 July 2010
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Felix Charles Penrice Leach Trustee 01 January 2019
KEBLE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
Lorna Mary Piper Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
TREFOR WILMOT LLEWELLYN Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
ANDREW DUNCAN BROWNE Trustee 09 March 2018
None on record
PATRICIA ANN HUDSON Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
The Venerable Judith Karen French Trustee 16 May 2017
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
THE RIGHT REVD DR STEVEN JOHN LINDSEY CROFT Trustee 06 July 2016
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF OXFORD'S DISCRETIONARY FUND
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
Received: On time
HELEN JANE CROLLA Trustee 08 February 2016
None on record
Rev DARREN WILLIAM MCFARLAND Trustee 01 January 2016
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON
Received: On time
NICOLA FLOWER Trustee 08 December 2014
None on record
PETER ROSS NORMAN Trustee 27 March 2013
None on record
Rev Mark David Bennet Trustee 01 January 2013
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
LADY FRANCES WINCHCOMBE'S THATCHAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MOOR MEADOW CHARITY
Received: On time
WESTCOTT HOUSE
Received: On time
JOANNA WHYTE MORIARTY Trustee 01 January 2013
FEED THE MINDS
Received: On time
SANDFORD ST MARTIN (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) TRUST
Received: On time
MAUREEN ELIZABETH LOMAS Trustee 01 January 2013
THE FOUNDATION OF SAINT MATTHIAS
Received: On time
KATHY WINROW Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
GORDON SCOTT ANDERSON JP Trustee 01 January 2010
SUNNINGHILL PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
ASCOT VOLUNTEER BUREAU
Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
Received: On time
Rev SARAH ELIZABETH SHARP Trustee 01 January 2010
BODICOTE CHURCH BOUNTY FUND
Received: On time
NELSON PITTAM WELFARE FUND
Received: On time
Rev TIMOTHY JAMES LINCOLN HARPER Trustee 01 January 2010
None on record
REVEREND MARY ANN HARWOOD Trustee 01 January 2010
None on record