THE PUMP (EAST BIRMINGHAM) LTD

Charity number: 1134459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 05 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 November 2019 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 05 November 2019 98 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download