Trustees DANE AND TRENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
68 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Arthur Wakelin | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Russ Bromley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jill Booth | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Audrey Haydon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jenny Tingle | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alec Needham | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Gordon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Anne Rachel Coates | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nicola Joy Langton-Miller | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mervyn Lovatt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Millard | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JULIE HALMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
John Funnell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
David Tildesley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Harvey Gilbert | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Bradley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Donlon | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Moreton | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sara Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Hancock | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
William Ian Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dorothy Wickstead | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Moss | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
David Lea | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Shaughnessy | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Bodell | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Myra Cowan | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Tomlinson | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE DONLON | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Farr | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Leake | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Marilyn Beckett | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Bernice McEvoy | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ALISON JANE DULEY | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Sherman | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH TWEATS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Kennerley | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Cicely Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ISOBEL WORTHINGTON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev MARGARET EATON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SAMUEL CLOWES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN WATSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HILARY BALSDON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev YVONNE PEARSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
ALLAN MOORE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
JOAN ELIZABETH CLARKE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFF BUTLER | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BARBARA KENNERLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN PERCIVAL | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN DULEY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARY JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JULIE N IMBER | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTIANA CASWELL | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
EILEEN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN STUART DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LINDA MARJORIE ASHBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROSEMARIE GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN RIGBY WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HERBERT BARRY DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
FRANK WILLIAM DEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID JOHN PICKLES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Ruth Elizabeth Pickles | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
AMANDA JEAN PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
AVRIL WAGHORN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.