Financial history FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £358.37k £356.84k £381.76k £378.30k £352.12k
Total expenditure £351.23k £393.05k £515.20k £398.33k £513.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A