Financial history West Cornwall Methodist Circuit

Charity number: 1135689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £154.73k £187.10k £237.97k £190.35k £205.45k
Total expenditure £314.96k £190.30k £339.80k £230.61k £265.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A