VISIONARY - LINKING LOCAL SIGHT LOSS CHARITIES

Charity number: 1135360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time Download