VISIONARY - LINKING LOCAL SIGHT LOSS CHARITIES

Charity number: 1135360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Mills Trustee 21 December 2021 None on record
Tom Harte Trustee 17 December 2021
WARGRAVE HOUSE LIMITED Received: On time
STUART CLAYTON Trustee 21 October 2016
HEARTBEAT NORTHWEST CARDIAC CARE Received: On time
OWEN JAMES WILLIAMS Chair 21 October 2016
WELSH ASSOCIATION OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED BOWLERS Received: 81 days late
MACHEN RECREATION CIO Received: On time
Susan Hoath Trustee 23 December 2021 None on record
Arwyn Elis Jones Trustee 21 October 2016 None on record
MICHAEL JOSEPH CONROY Trustee 15 January 2014
MICHAEL HOUSE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Charity is in administration
Arash Andalibi-Abadan Trustee 21 December 2021 None on record
Philippa Ann Crowther Trustee 25 October 2018 None on record
GRAHAM ARTHUR FINDLAY Trustee 15 January 2014
THOMAS POCKLINGTON TRUST Received: On time
Mark Peter Upton Trustee 17 December 2021 None on record