Accounts and annual returns PLYMOUTH ISLAMIC EDUCATION TRUST (PIETY)
Charity number: 1134986
Charity reporting is up to date (160 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 November 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 November 2021 | 27 February 2024 | 525 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2021 | 27 February 2024 | 525 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 November 2020 | 26 October 2023 | 766 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2020 | 26 October 2023 | 766 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 November 2019 | 16 May 2021 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2019 | 16 May 2021 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 November 2018 | 14 February 2020 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2018 | 14 February 2020 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window