THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) LIFE START CONNECTIONS

Charity number: 1135341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £85.99k £80.24k £74.73k £117.90k £216.55k
Total expenditure £88.07k £78.13k £76.29k £115.32k £125.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A