Financial history THE CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM ST MICHAELS CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1136247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £36.82k £27.83k £35.97k £66.49k £53.13k
Total expenditure £19.61k £33.14k £78.37k £34.28k £10.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A