THE CAMBRIDGE MALAYSIAN EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1136815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £416.32k £3.46m £150.52k £3.00m £1.50m
Total expenditure £2.55m £1.80m £1.98m £2.05m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.46m N/A £3.00m £1.50m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £467 N/A £1.81k £4.41k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.80m N/A £2.05m £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £19.35k N/A £21.34k £21.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0